Jain, Mukesh Kumar (CPSO#: 68067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 422
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: (613) 548-3364
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mick M.K. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jain ( CPSO# 68067 )

Business Address:
Suite 422
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 548-3364

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUKESH KUMAR JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999