Jain, Neelesh Kumar (CPSO#: 72674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of General Surgery
North York General Hospital
North York Division
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6577
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. K. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jain ( CPSO# 72674 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Suite GS-71a
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEELESH KUMAR JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005