Jain, Neeta (CPSO#: 71502)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jul 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 01 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 02 Feb 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1998 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2002