Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Jain, Padma (CPSO#: 52144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Jiwaji University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite #317
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 495-1919
Fax: (416) 495-9525
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Padma Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jain ( CPSO# 52144 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
801 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 510-0850

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 May 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from11:59 pm., February 6, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Padma Jain:

            i.    Dr. Jain shall be prohibited from engaging in all procedures as defined
                  in Part XI of O.Reg. 114/94 made under the Medicine Act, 1991;

            ii.   At her own expense, Dr. Jain shall retain a College approved preceptor on
                  record keeping in relation to her cosmetic practice for a period of six
                  months, and who has signed an undertaking in the form attached as
                  Schedule "A" [to the Order] (the "Cosmetic Practice Preceptor"). The
                  Cosmetic Practice Preceptor shall meet with Dr. Jain monthly and review a
                  minimum of 10 randomly chosen patient records per month with reports to
                  the College every two months.  Dr. Jain will abide at her own expense by
                  all recommendations of the Cosmetic Practice Preceptor with respect to
                  her medical record keeping, including with respect to any charting
                  improvements; and

            iii.  Dr. Jain shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of her practice
                  and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of
                  monitoring and enforcing her compliance with the terms of the Order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Feb 2012
Summary:

On February 6, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Padma Jain committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession 
in her care and treatment of 27 cosmetic surgical patients between 2001 and 2008 in the 
following ways: 
 
Her pre-operative care was substandard: 
      Her pre-operative evaluation of abdominoplasty patients was consistently minimal with 
      no record of the presence of hernia, amount of laxity or surgical plan; 
      Her pre-operative evaluation of blepharoplasty was consistently inadequate with no 
      inquiry about eye history and inadequate examination of the lids recorded; 
      Her pre-operative evaluation of breast augmentation was minimal without standard 
      comments on nipple position; 
      Liposuction was performed on patients with relative contraindications for this type of 
      surgery, including one patient with lupus; 
      The pre-operative evaluation for breast reduction and gynecomastia was insufficient in 
      that nipple position was not documented and discussed. 
 
Her intra-operative care of patients was substandard: 
      The operative notes for abdominoplasty, blepharoplasty and breast augmentation were 
      anatomically inaccurate and demonstrated a lack of knowledge in these areas of surgery; 
      The volume of fluid aspirated in one liposuction was above that which is acceptable in an 
      out-patient setting; 
      In another liposuction, surgery was performed within 48 hours after the completion of 
      another liposuction on the same patient; 
      DVT prophylaxis was not used in a large number of surgeries lasting longer than four 
      hours; 
      Excised breast tissue was not sent for pathological examination in the case of a patient 
      who was a 48 year old woman; 
      Breast augmentation surgery was  routinely performed without intravenous antibiotic 
      coverage; 
      Surgical counts of sharps, sponges and instruments were routinely inadequate; 
      Liposuction for breast reduction was performed on a patient who was not suited for the 
      procedure; 
      In one case, a clean surgical procedure was combined with a contaminated procedure 
      without intravenous antibiotic coverage. 
 
Her post-operative care was substandard: 
      Patients were routinely discharged too quickly after surgery; 
      One patient was not treated for symptoms of hypertension after major surgery; 
      A patient with a history of sleep apnea was not monitored overnight following surgery. 
 
Her charting was substandard: 
      Many OR notes were illegible and some were missing; 
      No recovery room record exists for any of the surgeries. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Jain's certificate 
      of registration: 
      i.    Dr. Jain shall be prohibited from engaging in all procedures as defined in Part XI 
            of O.Reg. 114/94 made under the Medicine Act, 1991; 
 
      ii.   At her own expense, Dr. Jain shall retain a College approved preceptor on record 
            keeping in relation to her cosmetic practice for a period of six months, and who 
            has signed an undertaking in the form attached as Schedule "A" [to the Order] (the 
            "Cosmetic Practice Preceptor"). The Cosmetic Practice Preceptor shall meet with 
            Dr. Jain monthly and review a minimum of 10 randomly chosen patient records 
            per month with reports to the College every two months.  Dr. Jain will abide at 
            her own expense by all recommendations of the Cosmetic Practice Preceptor with 
            respect to her medical record keeping, including with respect to any charting 
            improvements; and 
 
      iii.  Dr. Jain shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of her practice and such 
            other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing 
            her compliance with the terms of the Order. 
 
2.    Dr. Jain appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
3.    Dr. Jain pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the 
      date of this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 6, 2012