Jain, Rachna (CPSO#: 62164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: Humar, Rachna (used until: 06 Aug 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
2430 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone: (613) 736-6946
Fax: (613) 736-6948
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachna Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jain ( CPSO# 62164 )

Business Address:
South Bank Medical Clinic
2430 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone Number: (613) 736-6946

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHNA JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1991