Jain, Ramesh Chandra (CPSO#: 27708)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Nov 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Rajasthan University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2006

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 2, 2006
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As from October 2, 2006, Dr. Ramesh Chandra Jain undertakes to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario the following:

(1) I, Dr. Ramesh Chandra Jain, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, no
later than 11:59 p.m. on November 1, 2006.

(2) I, Dr. Ramesh Chandra Jain, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a
licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

(3) I, Dr. Ramesh Chandra Jain, acknowledge that, in consideration for this undertaking, the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee for
failure to meet the standard of practice of the profession, conflict of interest, falsification of a record and
incompetence, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated July 5, 2006.

(4) I, Dr. Ramesh Chandra Jain, agree that, in the event that the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for
registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a
discipline proceeding on the basis of breech of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to
proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated July 5, 2006.

(5) I, Dr. Ramesh Chandra Jain, hereby agree that should the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated July 5, 2006
pursuant to paragraph 4 of this undertaking, I will bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage of time
might cause to my ability to make full answer and defence, and waive the right to seek any remedy on
the basis of the passage of time.

(6) I, Dr. Ramesh Chandra Jain, consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as
information that is available to the public.

(7) I, Dr. Ramesh Chandra Jain, acknowledge that I have obtained independent legal advice before giving this
undertaking.