Jain, Sanjive (CPSO#: 55776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2C-201 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J5
Phone: (905) 436-5335
Fax: (905) 436-9964
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13291 Yonge Street
suite 300
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjive Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jain ( CPSO# 55776 )

Business Address:
Suite 2C
201 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 436-5335

Business Address:
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7843

Business Address:
Suite 15
951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 2A7

Business Address:
197 Third Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 3L5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJIVE JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986