Jain, Shalini (CPSO#: 81920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeview Medical
Unit Q
6 Speers Boulevard
Amherstview ON  K7N 1Z6
Phone: (613) 634-9597
Fax: (613) 634-1668
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bayridge After Hours Medical Clinic
8-775 Strand Blvd
Kingston ON  K7P 2S7
Canada
Phone: (613) 546-5506
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jain ( CPSO# 81920 )

Business Address:
Lakeview Medical
Unit Q
6 Speers Boulevard
Amherstview ON  K7N 1Z6
Phone Number: (613) 634-9597

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHALINI JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Apr 2005 to 26 Jun 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 29 May 2006 to 28 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 29 May 2007 to 11 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007