Jain, Trevor Nirmal (CPSO#: 73790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Elizabeth Hospital
60 Riverside Drive
Charlottetown PE  C1A 8T5
Phone: (902) 894-2111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jul 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR NIRMAL JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 25 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2000 to 30 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 05 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2014