Jain, Umesh (CPSO#: 62254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 501
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 767-0995
Fax: (416) 767-0992
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Saint Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 6126
Fax: (416) 530-6222
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Umesh Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Jain ( CPSO# 62254 )

Business Address:
501 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 767-0995

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UMESH JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991