Jaipargas, Charles Cholabhan (CPSO#: 65148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
1750 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5H5
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree Medical Centre
545 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 4E7
Canada
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES CHOLABHAN JAIPARGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIPARGAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993