Jairath, Vipul (CPSO#: 108346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room A10-228
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3655
Fax: (519) 663-3658
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Robarts Clinical Trials Inc.
Suite 200
100 Dundas Street
London ON  N6A 5B6
Canada
Phone: 226-270-7675
Fax: 519-931-5278
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vipul Jairath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Jairath ( CPSO# 108346)

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Room A10-228
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3655

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Dec 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Vipul Jairath may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Gastroenterology,  University  of Western Ontario, in
                        which  Dr. Jairath holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Jairath no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This certificate  is issued on December 21, 2015, and expires on June 30,
            2018. Upon renewal of Dr.  Jairath's  academic appointment at the University of
            Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in
            paragraph 2 above.