Jaiyeola, Adeola Olufolake (CPSO#: 64582)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ibadan, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jul 1992
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jul 1992
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Oct 1994
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1994