Jakhi, Tanvi Shashikant (CPSO#: 110761)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 12 Oct 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 13 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017