Jaklis, Ziad (CPSO#: 66571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 541-2638
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

980 Oliver rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ziad Jaklis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 7 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZIAD JAKLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKLIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999