Jaksic, Tomislav (CPSO#: 33796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boston Children's Hospital
300 Longwood Avenue
Boston MA  02115
United States
Phone: (617) 355-9600
Fax: (617) 730-0477

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMISLAV JAKSIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKSIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Paediatric Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 6 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1982