Jakubovic, Henry Robert (CPSO#: 33678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1982


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5074
Fax: (416) 864-5421
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone: (416) 652-6101
Fax: (416) 652-1994
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 23 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. HENRY ROBERT JAKUBOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKUBOVIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1982