Jakubovicz, Difat Esther (CPSO#: 65251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family and
Community Medicine
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Difat E. Jakubovicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jakubovicz ( CPSO# 65251 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Family and Community Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIFAT ESTHER JAKUBOVICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKUBOVICZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993