Jalali, Subash (CPSO#: 51011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kashmiri, Urdu

Education:Kashmir University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
1 Young Street
Suite 413
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 577-4670
Fax: (905) 577-6204
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Subash Jalali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jalali ( CPSO# 51011 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
1 Young Street
Suite 413
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 577-5721

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBASH JALALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1984