Jalayer, Massoud (CPSO#: 86936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Emergency Department
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Massoud Jalayer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jalayer ( CPSO# 86936 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Emergency Department
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MASSOUD JALAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALAYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012