Jalink, Diederick Willem (CPSO#: 70280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Burr 2 - 056
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7661
Fax: (613) 548-2500
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diederick Jalink Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jalink ( CPSO# 70280 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Burr 2 - 056
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIEDERICK WILLEM JALINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALINK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996