Jamal, Abida Sophina (CPSO#: 63935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
2077 Lakeshore Blvd West
Toronto ON  M8V 4C2
Phone: 647 722 2370
Fax: 416 367-4301
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1450 O Connor Drive
Toronto ON  M4B 1Z1
Canada
Phone: 647 722-2370
Fax: 289 914 6023
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 0G4
Canada
Phone: 289 914-8333
Fax: 289 914 6023
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1595 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 3K3
Canada
Phone: 613 482-0118
Fax: 613 680 6420
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 01 May 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Jamal’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee. It is alleged that Dr. Jamal failed to maintain the standard of practice, engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and conduct unbecoming a physician in her medical research related to osteoporosis.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): March 5-8, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 01 May 2017 Active View Details [+]

            As from 12:01 a.m., May 1, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Abida Sophina Jamal:

            Practice Restriction 

                  (i)   Dr. Jamal shall not seek an appointment or re-appointment for
                        privileges at any research or academic hospital or institution,
                        including any University, in Canada or in any other jurisdiction;
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Jamal shall not conduct or participate in any way in any
                        clinical or research studies and/or publish any pending research;
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Jamal shall not participate in any way in any academic or
                        research  presentations or publications;
                  
                  (iv)  Dr. Jamal shall cooperate with with unannounced inspections of her
                        practice, patient records and practice-related records by a College
                        representative for the purposes of monitoring her compliance with
                        the provisions of this Order; and
                  
                  (v)   Dr. Jamal shall not interfere with and shall consent to the College
                        making any inquiries of any person or body who may have relevant
                        information regarding her compliance with the terms of the Order of
                        the Inquiries, Complaints and Discipline Committee of the College
                        of Physicians and Surgeons dated April 28, 2017.