Jamal, Hanif Nazir (CPSO#: 81082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
Oakville Site
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 338-4146
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brookfield Place
181 Bay Street Suite
Suite 3000
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

247 North Service Rd W
Suite 201
Oakville ON  L6M 3E6
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2625
Fax: (905) 845-6363
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jamal ( CPSO# 81082 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Suite 3000
181 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 507-6600

Business Address:
201 - 247 North Service Road West
Oakville ON  L6M 3E6
Phone Number: (905) 845-2625

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANIF NAZIR JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2006