Jamal, Munir Ahmed (CPSO#: 69128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 607-6262
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNIR AHMED JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000