Jamalalail, Yasser Abdulrahman Hamza (CPSO#: 82450)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014