Jambrosic, Jadranka Adriana (CPSO#: 31073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsway Dermatology
Suite 1000
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 231-0100
Fax: (416) 231-0109
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Department of dermatology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dynacare
115 Midair Cr.
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
Phone: 905 790 3515 Ext. 5399
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jadranka Jambrosic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Jambrosic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jambrosic ( CPSO# 31073 )

Business Address:
Kingsway Dermatology
1243 Islington Avenue
Suite 1000
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 231-0100

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Dermatology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
115 MidAir Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3515

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JADRANKA ADRIANA JAMBROSIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMBROSIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1977 to 12 Jun 1978
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 16 Sep 1978
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1979 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1979