James, Andrew Gibson (CPSO#: 54683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Auckland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6345
Fax: (416) 813-5245
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW GIBSON JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1993
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Nov 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1996