James, Baburajan J J (CPSO#: 42860)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: James, B J J Rajan (used until: 14 Jul 2002 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 420 Winston Boulevard Cambridge, ON N3C 3Y5
Date Received: 17 Sep 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Sep 2015