James, Debra Jean (CPSO#: 55409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: Williams, Debra Jean (used until: 06 Aug 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway #2 East
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-4934
Fax: (905) 721-4369
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David and Debra James Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. James ( CPSO# 56387 )
Dr. D. James ( CPSO# 55409 )

Business Address:
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway #2 East
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 721-4934

Business Address:
7 - 700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 264-3443

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA JEAN JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1988