James, Jacqueline Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite L5-026
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8369
Fax: (416) 586-3194
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Elizabeth James Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. James ( CPSO# 58323 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite L5-026
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-8369

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ELIZABETH JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989