James, Michael John (CPSO#: 32737)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 Fax: 647 933 2904
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014


Address: Records Management Limited - Head Office Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Phone: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Jul 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 20, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective June 20, 2014, Dr. James has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.