James, Neil Edward (CPSO#: 67800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Hatt Street
Dundas ON  L9H 2G2
Phone: (289) 345-0137
Fax: (289) 345-0008
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

445 Inglehart st N
Oakville ON  L6J 3J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 844-8800
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil E. James Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. James ( CPSO# 67800 )

Business Address:
35 Hatt Street
Dundas ON  L9H 2G2
Phone Number: (289) 345-0137

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL EDWARD JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996