James, Patricia Mary (CPSO#: 20889)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1990