James, Paul Damien (CPSO#: 87310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rm 9N-981
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5881
Fax: (416) 340-5324
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Damien James Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. James ( CPSO# 87310 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 9N-981
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL DAMIEN JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2011