James, Thresiamma (CPSO#: 57707)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kerala, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Unit 600 8600 Franklin Avenue Fort McMurray Alberta T9H 4G8
Date Received: 24 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013