Jamieson, Elizabeth Marian (CPSO#: 21497)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 18 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: Prockop, Elizabeth Marian (used until: 31 Aug 1972 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1998