Jamieson, Iain Charles (CPSO#: 55703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 743-6222
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I.C. Jamieson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Jamieson ( CPSO# 55703 )

Business Address:
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 743-6222

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAIN CHARLES JAMIESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMIESON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986