Jamieson, Maurice Allen (CPSO#: 19326)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jul 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995