Jamieson, William George (CPSO#: 21137)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1998