Jamshaid, Mamoona (CPSO#: 66458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V4
Phone: (613) 244-2005
Fax: (613) 244-2004
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

311 McArthur Avenue
# 103
Vanier ON  K1L 8M3
Canada
Phone: (613) 739-7494
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAMOONA JAMSHAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMSHAID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Nov 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 14 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1996