Janakiraman, Rengarajan (CPSO#: 87535)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2007 to 07 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 08 Sep 2007 to 14 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008