Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Janes, Ronald David (CPSO#: 56372)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998