Jang, Douglas Kye (CPSO#: 70186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stoufville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7111
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Jang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jang ( CPSO# 70186 )

Business Address:
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 294-2290

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS KYE JANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1998