Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Jang, Eddy (CPSO#: 65245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkway Mall
Suite 208
85 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 4B8
Phone: (416) 386-0139
Fax: (416) 386-0141
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eddy Jang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jang ( CPSO# 65245 )

Business Address:
208 - 85 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 386-0139

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDDY JANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993