Janhunen, David Richard (CPSO#: 91391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon ON  P0T 2J0
Phone: (807) 887-5252 Ext. 2
Fax: (807) 887-1645
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID RICHARD JANHUNEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANHUNEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 20 Oct 2010 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2011