Janicki, Joseph Aloysius (CPSO#: 83450)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Case Western Reserve University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007