Janikowski, Andrew Mieczyslaw (CPSO#: 28422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8 Hill Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 969-6798
Fax: (613) 476-6798
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew M. Janikowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Janikowski ( CPSO# 28422 )

Business Address:
8 Hill Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 969-6798

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW MIECZYSLAW JANIKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANIKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976