Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Janjua, Sadiq (CPSO#: 25152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hindi, Italian, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dundas Street Walk-In Clinic
Suite 209
3416 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 2S1
Phone: (416) 763-3111
Fax: (416) 248-9912
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sadiq Janjua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Janjua ( CPSO# 25152 )

Business Address:
Dundas Street Walk-In Clinic
209 - 3416 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 763-3111


Corporation Name: Meer Janjua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Janjua ( CPSO# 25152 )
Dr. M. Janjua ( CPSO# 96353 )

Business Address:
55 Port Street East
Mississauga ON  L5G 4P3

Business Address:
209-3416 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 763-3111

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SADIQ JANJUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANJUA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1972