Janmohamed, Amirali Kassamali (CPSO#: 66897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1719 Lawrence Ave East
Suite 205
Toronto ON  M1R 2X7
Canada
Phone: (416) 609-1100
Fax: (416) 609-1102
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2391 Eglington Ave East
Toronto ON  M1K 2M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 750-9000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 726-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Janmohamed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Janmohamed ( CPSO# 66897 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8333

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
412 - 1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8

Business Address:
2391 Eglington Avenue
Toronto ON  M1K 2M5
Phone Number: (416) 750-9000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIRALI KASSAMALI JANMOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANMOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997