Jansen, Jan Willem (CPSO#: 88037)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French, German

Education:Free University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster University Medical Centre Department of Pathology 1200 Main Street West Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 Jan 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015